Grbac, Leonardo (CPSO#: 55779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: Grbac, Leonard (used until: 11 Feb 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Workplace Safety & Insurance Board
4th Floor
200 Front Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 3J1
Phone: (416) 344-4508
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CompreMed Canada
665 Davis Drive, Suite 201
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Canada
Phone: (905) 953-5445
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grbac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking for medical records from the Credit Valley Family Physicians After Hours Clinic can contact: Dr. Leonardo Grbac Email: grbac@rogers.com
Instructions: .
Date Received: 04 Jan 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEONARDO GRBAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRBAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1986