Green, Douglas Stephen (CPSO#: 62223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8010
Fax: (613) 737-8115
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Green ( CPSO# 62223 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Department of Psychiatry 4th Floor
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS STEPHEN GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1992