Green, Jessica Ashleigh (CPSO#: 95604)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 O'Brien Street
Unit 300
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone: (705) 259-6249
Fax: 705-259-6251
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Green Gladwish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gladwish ( CPSO# 95748 )
Dr. J. Green ( CPSO# 95604 )

Business Address:
Simcoe Muskoka Regional Cancer Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3B 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 327-9152

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2932

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA ASHLEIGH GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2016