Greenberg, David Edward (CPSO#: 60907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
619 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2P8
Phone: (416) 964-1131
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Greenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Greenberg ( CPSO# 60907 )

Business Address:
619 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 964-7011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID EDWARD GREENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 15 Jul 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990