Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gregor, James Christopher (CPSO#: 59702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Room E6 103
800 Commissioners Road
London On N6A 5W9
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6582
Fax: (519) 667-6820
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Gregor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gregor ( CPSO# 59702 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
Suite E6-103
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6582

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 15 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES CHRISTOPHER GREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREGOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1990