Grier, Elizabeth Faith (CPSO#: 83687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
309 Alfred Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3S4
Phone: (613) 344-2090
Fax: (613) 531-5956
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Grier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Grier ( CPSO# 83687 )

Business Address:
309 Alfred Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3S4
Phone Number: (613) 344-2090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH FAITH GRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008