Grigore, Emil-Vasile (CPSO#: 52261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Elgin Medical Centre
171 Main Street
West Lorne ON  N0L 2P0
Phone: (519) 768-1326
Fax: (519) 768-2953
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. V. Grigore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Grigore ( CPSO# 52261 )

Business Address:
West Elgin Medical Centre
171 Main Street West
West Lorne ON  N0L 2P0
Phone Number: (519) 768-1326

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMIL-VASILE GRIGORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIGORE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1989