Grigoriadis, Elizabeth (CPSO#: 69357)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6344
Fax: (416) 323-6115
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Grigoriadis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Grigoriadis ( CPSO# 69357 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6344

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 12 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH GRIGORIADIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIGORIADIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2000