Gringorten, Natalie Aviva (CPSO#: 82296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V1R8
Phone: 416 494 2120
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Gringorten Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 28 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE AVIVA GRINGORTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRINGORTEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 23 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2005 to 06 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2006