Gronas, Rolf (CPSO#: 71387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St.
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rolf Gronas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gronas ( CPSO# 71387 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
The Cumberland Clinic
225 - 162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 925-0113

Business Address:
North York Branson
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
Rice Cosmetic Surgery
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 391-4048

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROLF GRONAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRONAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002