Gross, Peter Lawrence (CPSO#: 68052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42640
Fax: (905) 574-7625
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Gross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gross ( CPSO# 68052 )

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Suite 211
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 545-5303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER LAWRENCE GROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2003