Grossman, Daphna Laurel (CPSO#: 65531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000 Ext. 3508
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daphna Grossman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Grossman ( CPSO# 65531 )

Business Address:
6W - 3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6002

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
375 - 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAPHNA LAUREL GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993