Grossman, Rachelle Leigh (CPSO#: 95529)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 700
1240 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone: (416) 479-0405
Fax: 888-949-3222
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Holt Renfrew Centre
concourse level - 50 bloor st west
Toronto ON  M4W 1A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 964-6150
Fax: 866-655-7686
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHELLE LEIGH GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013