Grygowski, Beata Katarzyna (CPSO#: 67009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2900 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M8X 1B5
Phone: (416) 232-1687
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grygowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Grygowski ( CPSO# 67009 )

Business Address:
2900 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M8X 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 232-1687

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEATA KATARZYNA GRYGOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYGOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998