Guest, Christopher Louis (CPSO#: 70461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Radiology Consultants
Suite 114-115
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone: 705 728-9090 Ext. 43466
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Guest Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Guest ( CPSO# 70461 )

Business Address:
Little Lake Health Centre
LL01
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 722-8036

Business Address:
Barrie Medical Arts
Unir 114-115
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone Number: (705) 726-4531

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER LOUIS GUEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUEST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001