Guirguis, Farid Nabih Habib (CPSO#: 89270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Armenian, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
kent place mall
189 Kent street W
suite 209
Lindsay
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone: 705 320 7616
Fax: 705 320 9954
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: 705 324 6111
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farid Guirguis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Guirguis ( CPSO# 89270 )

Business Address:
Kent Place Mall
Suite 209
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone Number: (705) 320-7616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARID NABIH HABIB GUIRGUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUIRGUIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013