Gunn, Beth Marie (CPSO#: 87697)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18th Floor
655 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Phone: (416) 217-3974
Fax: (416) 217-3975
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

True North Imaging
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-1777
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETH MARIE GUNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2007 to 21 Oct 2007
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009