Gunning, Alan Lee (CPSO#: 57994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
245 Argyle Street South
Caledonia ON  N3W 2J2
Phone: (905) 765-5245
Fax: (905) 765-1090
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Gunning Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gunning ( CPSO# 57994 )

Business Address:
Suite 3
245 Argyle Street South
Caledon ON  N3W 2J2
Phone Number: (905) 765-5245

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN LEE GUNNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNNING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Aug 1990
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1989