Guntley-Lorimer, Edith Mae (CPSO#: 31157)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Jamaican Creole

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guntley-Lorimer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2014

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: July 16, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Guntley-Lorimer resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.