Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gupta, Anil (CPSO#: 70301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone: (905) 276-4535
Fax: (905) 276-1218
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anil Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 70301 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
307 - 3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone Number: (905) 276-4535

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIL GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2000