Gupta, Anjalee Shilpa (CPSO#: 84426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Market Square
2130 North Park Drive
Unit 247
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 595-1587
Fax: 855-680-6800
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suman Chatterjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee ( CPSO# 66284 )
Dr. S. Chatterjee ( CPSO# 81386 )
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 84426 )

Business Address:
Unit 247
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 595-1586


Corporation Name: Anjalee Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee ( CPSO# 81386 )
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 84426 )

Business Address:
Unit 247
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 595-1587

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANJALEE SHILPA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2008