Gupta, Rajesh (CPSO#: 68051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Carter Wing
Suite 4-150
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5541
Fax: (416) 864-5714
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gupta ( CPSO# 68051 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 4C-150
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5541

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJESH GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998