Gupta, Sanjeev (CPSO#: 54906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3429 Fieldgate Drive
Mississauga ON  L4X 2J4
Phone: (905) 602-8448
Fax: 905-232-0484
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjeev Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gupta ( CPSO# 54906 )

Business Address:
3429 Fieldgate Drive
Mississauga ON  L4X 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 602-8448

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJEEV GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1987