Gupta, Sanjoy Kumar (CPSO#: 71538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, French, Hindi

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 601
1265 East Arthur Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone: (807) 623-3937
Fax: (807) 623-3946
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Sanjoy K Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gupta ( CPSO# 71538 )

Business Address:
601 - 1265 East Arthur Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone Number: (807) 623-3937

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJOY KUMAR GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2003