Gupta, Sunita (CPSO#: 85051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Jammu University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1050,UNIT 3,UPPER GAGE
HAMILTON
Hamilton ON  L8V 5B7
Phone: (289) 396-2468
Fax: (289) 396-3087
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sunita Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gupta ( CPSO# 85051 )
Dr. R. Gupta ( CPSO# 106468)

Business Address:
Unit 3
1050 Upper Gaze Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8V 5B7
Phone Number: (289) 396-2468

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNITA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2014