Gurfinkel, Ronen (CPSO#: 88805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham-Kingston Medical Centre
Suite 18
3545 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1M 1R6
Phone: (416) 266-6600
Fax: (416) 266-6604
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Comprehensive Healthcare Network
Suite 301
294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 693-3030
Fax: (416) 693-3033
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Seitelbach and Gurfinkel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gurfinkel ( CPSO# 88805 )
Dr. M. Seitelbach ( CPSO# 88944 )

Business Address:
Markham-Kingston Medical Centre
Suite 18
3545 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1M 1R6

Business Address:
Oncology Clinic - Tower 1
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONEN GURFINKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GURFINKEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012