Gutauskas, Andrea Veronika (CPSO#: 81207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 107
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 725-9180
Fax: (613) 725-1852
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gutauskas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gutauskas ( CPSO# 81207 )

Business Address:
107 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 725-9180

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA VERONIKA GUTAUSKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUTAUSKAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009