Gverzdys, Sharunas Antanas (CPSO#: 55842)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 18 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Gverzdys Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gverzdys ( CPSO# 55842 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 6B5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1988
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 18 Dec 2017