Ha, Andrew Hongil (CPSO#: 84918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: 905-804-8393
Fax: 905-615-8537
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Ha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ha ( CPSO# 84918 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 804-8393

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW HONGIL HA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2011