Haaland, Derek Allan (CPSO#: 79518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: (705) 734-3943
Fax: (705) 734-0007
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster University Medical Centre
Divisions of Clinical Immunology &
Allergy and Rheumatology
Room 3V51 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76401
Fax: (905) 521-4971
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.A. Haaland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Haaland ( CPSO# 79518 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 734-3943

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 03 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK ALLAN HAALAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAALAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 12 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 13 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2008