Habert, Jeffrey Steven (CPSO#: 58146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1298
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Habert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Habert ( CPSO# 58146 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone Number: (905) 881-6667

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY STEVEN HABERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1988