Habib, Rami (CPSO#: 66556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper Canada Family Health Team
5 Home Street
Brockville Ontario
K6V 0A5
Brockville ON  K6V 0A5
Phone: 613-423-3333
Fax: (613) 423-3334
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lanark County Mental Health
88 Cornelia Street West
Smith Falls ON
K7A 5K9
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 5K9
Canada
Phone: 613-283-2170
Fax: 613-283-9018
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Habib Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Habib ( CPSO# 66556 )

Business Address:
Unit 2A
88 Cornelia Street West
Ottawa ON  K1V 2A4
Phone Number: (613) 283-2170

Business Address:
5 Home Street
Brockville ON  K6V 0A5
Phone Number: (613) 423-3333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMI HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1998