Habiba, Ummi (CPSO#: 95293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line L7M 4Y1
Burlington, ON
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: 1-855-210-0757
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Habiba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Habiba ( CPSO# 95293 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 1Y4
Phone Number: (855) 210-0757

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UMMI HABIBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIBA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Oct 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016