Hacking, Paige Elise (CPSO#: 105819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Old South Maternity Care
Suite 208
190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone: (519) 438-5101
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

499 Oxford St E
London ON  N5Y 3H8
Canada
Phone: (519) 672-8618
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

London Family Health Team
1261 Beaverbrook Ave
London ON  N6H 0G6
Canada
Phone: (519) 642-2077
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

London Doctors Relief Service
499 Oxford St E
London ON  N5Y 3H8
Canada
Phone: (519) 672-8618
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAIGE ELISE HACKING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACKING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017