Haebe, James Robert (CPSO#: 56775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 560
1145 Hunt Club
Ottawa ON  K1V 0V3
Phone: (613) 738-2378
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Haebe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Haebe ( CPSO# 56775 )

Business Address:
560 - 1145 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Phone Number: (613) 738-2378

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ROBERT HAEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAEBE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1988