Haggarty, John Michael (CPSO#: 59777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
710 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 5P7
Phone: (807) 624-3400 Ext. 3457
Fax: (807) 624-3401
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Haggarty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Haggarty ( CPSO# 59777 )

Business Address:
710 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 5P7
Phone Number: (807) 624-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL HAGGARTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAGGARTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989