Hahn, Karin Marie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 68050)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: Gwyn, Karin Marie Elizabeth Hahn (used until: 24 Sep 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Medical Oncology
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Fax: (519) 685-8624
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. M. E. Hahn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hahn ( CPSO# 68050 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Program
Medical Oncology
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8640

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARIN MARIE ELIZABETH HAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2006