Haider, Syed Yasser Ammar (CPSO#: 84203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-2755
Fax: (905) 472-3455
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-2755
Fax: (905) 472-3455
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Haider Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Haider ( CPSO# 84203 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
Unit 406
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-2755

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYED YASSER AMMAR HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 May 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2007