Haile Meskel, Helena (CPSO#: 63045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Centenary Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4891
Fax: (416) 281-7486
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELENA HAILE MESKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAILE MESKEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1992