Hailemeskel, Yemisrach (CPSO#: 59928)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, Slovak

Education:University of Comenius, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
1670 Dufferin Medical Center
Toronto ON  M6H 3M2
Phone: (416) 537-2438
Fax: (416) 537-9056
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. Hailemeskel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Hailemeskel ( CPSO# 59928 )

Business Address:
1670 Dufferin Medical Center
Suite 207
Toronto ON  M6H 3M2
Phone Number: (416) 537-2438

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YEMISRACH HAILEMESKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAILEMESKEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1989