Hainer, Steven Charles (CPSO#: 68180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4-55 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Phone: (705) 324-2561
Fax: (705) 328-1816
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven C. Hainer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hainer ( CPSO# 68180 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
55 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Phone Number: (705) 324-2561

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN CHARLES HAINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAINER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996