Hale, Nicole Christina (CPSO#: 82928)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Dept. Of Anesthesia
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613)721-2000 Ext. 2900
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole C. Hale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hale ( CPSO# 82928 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 24 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE CHRISTINA HALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 24 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2009 to 24 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2010