Hall, Darlene Vera (CPSO#: 70215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Callaghan Crescent
Oakville ON  L6H 5H7
Phone: 647-502-4222
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Village Healing Centre
240 Roncesvalles Ave
Toronto ON  M6R 2L8
Canada
Phone: 647-502-4222
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Aberfoyle Clinic
304 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M9B 6E2
Canada
Phone: 416-231-7968
Fax: 416-231-7982
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darlene Hall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARLENE VERA HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998