Halliday, Sarah Marie Francoise (CPSO#: 76256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6526
Fax: (613) 798-2999
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Halliday Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Halliday ( CPSO# 76256 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jul 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH MARIE FRANCOISE HALLIDAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALLIDAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 22 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 23 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 10 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 11 Jul 2005 to 10 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 11 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2008