Halliday, William Carroll (CPSO#: 33108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1905
1 Palace Pier Court
Toronto
M8V 3W9
Toronto ON  M8V 3W9
Phone: (416) 253-7527
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.C. Halliday Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Halliday ( CPSO# 33108 )

Business Address:
Suite 1905
1 Palace Pier Court
Toronto ON  M8V 3W9
Phone Number: (416) 253-7527

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 02 Dec 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM CARROLL HALLIDAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALLIDAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1998