Halman, Stephen Ira (CPSO#: 66882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodbridge Orthopaedics
8333 WESTON ROAD
Suite 302
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (416) 745-9195
Fax: 905 850 9175
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 416 242 1000 Ext. 23000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Halman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Halman ( CPSO# 66882 )

Business Address:
Woodbridge Orthopaedics
Suite 302
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (416) 745-9195

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5185

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone Number: (416) 243-3612

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN IRA HALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000