Halpern, Janice Rise (CPSO#: 31509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
244 Dupont Street
Toronto ON  M5R 1V7
Phone: (416) 962-0228
Fax: (416) 787-6741
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Halpern Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Halpern ( CPSO# 31509 )
Dr. S. Halpern ( CPSO# 30080 )

Business Address:
Suite M5 318
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100


Corporation Name: Dr. Janice Halpern Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Halpern ( CPSO# 31509 )
Dr. S. Halpern ( CPSO# 30080 )

Business Address:
244 Dupont Street
Toronto ON  M5R 1V7
Phone Number: (416) 962-0228

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE RISE HALPERN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALPERN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1980