Hamdy, Hazem Ali (CPSO#: 31986)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hazem A. Hamdy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 27, 2009
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF RESTRICTION OF PRIVILEGES:

On June 26, 2009, Ottawa Hospital notified the College that Dr. Hazem Ali Hamdy's privileges were restricted, effective May 27, 2009.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2009
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 13 Oct 2010
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2010
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 13 Jan 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Oct 2010
Summary:

On October 13, 2010, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Hamdy's admission and found that 
he committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
practice of the profession in respect of his sterilization techniques and sterilization of his 
operating environment.     
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    Dr. Hamdy appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
2.    The Registrar to suspend Dr. Hamdy's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) 
      months commencing from the date of this Order. 
 
3.    The Registrar impose the following specified terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
      Hamdy's certificate of registration for an indefinite period or for the specified period of 
      times set out herein: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Hamdy shall not perform circumcisions and shall post a sign, in the form 
            attached as Appendix "A", in a prominent place in the waiting room and in the 
            examination/procedure rooms in his office. 
 
      (b)   Dr. Hamdy shall use sterile procedures at all times in his office. 
 
      (c)   At his own expense, Dr. Hamdy shall engage in monthly supervision of infection 
            control practices and procedures by a supervisor who has been approved by the 
            College and who has executed an undertaking in the form attached as Appendix 
            "B", for a period of two (2) years from the date of this Order. 
 
      (d)   At his own expense, Dr Hamdy shall ensure that a member of a regulated health 
            profession, who has been approved by the College and who has executed an 
            undertaking in the form attached as Appendix "C", be present for all intra-articular 
            injections and office surgical procedures that cause a break in the skin for a period 
            of one (1) year from the date of this Order. 
 
      (e)   At his own expense, Dr. Hamdy shall successfully complete, within 
            approximately 18 months, education programs acceptable to the College in: 
 
            (i)   Record-Keeping; 
            (ii)  Ethics; and 
            (iii) Communications and Informed Consent;  
 
      and shall provide proof to the College of his successful completion of the College 
      approved education programs as set out above in paragraphs 4(e)(i)-(iii). 
 
      (f)   At his own expense, Dr. Hamdy shall successfully complete, within 
            approximately 6 months, an education program acceptable to the College in: 
 
            (i)   Infection Control 
 
and shall provide proof to the College of his successful completion of the College approved 
education program. 
 
 
      (g)   At his own expense, Dr. Hamdy shall undergo a reassessment of his practice in 
            approximately one (1) year from date of the Order. 
 
      (h)   Dr. Hamdy shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and 
            patient charts by a College representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring and 
            enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order. 
 
4.    Dr. Hamdy pay to the College costs in the amount of $3650 within 30 days of the date of 
      this Order.  

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 13, 2010