Hamdy, Nermeen Ramadan Ibrahim (CPSO#: 73685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4A 2V6
Phone: (416) 759-0184
Fax: (416) 759-4583
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Hamdy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NERMEEN RAMADAN IBRAHIM HAMDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2001 to 30 Nov 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001