Hameed, Nageen (CPSO#: 73081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Pushto, Urdu

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 580
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 338-0550
Fax: (905) 338-3187
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nageen Hameed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hameed ( CPSO# 73081 )

Business Address:
Unit 580
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 338-0550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAGEEN HAMEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 1998 to 21 Oct 1998
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2001